Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0519812
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.07.1998 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] |
24.06.1998 |
Communication/fee (R.58(5) EPC1973) |
|
07.04.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition |
|
07.04.1998 |
Communication/fee (R.58(5) EPC1973) |
|
17.12.1997 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition |
|
17.12.1997 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
16.05.1997 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
08.03.1997 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
29.10.1996 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
15.03.1996 |
Opposition filed |
published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] |
09.03.1996 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
17.11.1995 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] |
07.07.1995 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] |
05.07.1995 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] |
02.08.1994 |
First examination report |
|
16.06.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] |
06.11.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] |