EP0519812 - Coaxial connector for connecting a coaxial cable to an electronic printed circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RADIALL Société anonyme dite: 101, rue Philibert Hoffmann 93116 Rosny sous Bois / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states RADIALL Société anonyme dite: 101, rue Philibert Hoffmann 93116 Rosny sous Bois / FR | ||
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states RADIALL Société anonyme dite: 101, rue Philibert Hoffmann F-93116 Rosny sous Bois / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ginet, Guy Alain 11, rue Porte de la Buisse F-38500 Voiron / FR | [1992/52] | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André, et al Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | Leszczynski, André, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401682.7 | 17.06.1992 | [1992/52] | Priority number, date | FR19910007370 | 17.06.1991 Original published format: FR 9107370 | [1992/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0519812 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0519812 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0519812 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R17/12 | [1992/52] | CPC: |
H01R24/50 (EP,US);
H01R13/20 (EP,US);
H01R13/567 (EP,US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1992/52] | Title | German: | Koaxialverbinder zum Verbinden eines Koaxialkabels mit einer elektronischen gedruckten Schaltung | [1996/01] | English: | Coaxial connector for connecting a coaxial cable to an electronic printed circuit | [1992/52] | French: | Connecteur coaxial pour le raccordement d'un câble coaxial à une carte imprimée de circuit électronique | [1992/52] |
Former [1992/52] | Koaxialverbinder zum Verbinden eines Koaxialkabels an eine elektronische gedruckte Schaltung | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/01: Teilanmeldung 95110136.9 eingereicht am 17/06/92 | EPB 1996/01: Divisional application 95110136.9 filed on 17/06/92 | EPB 1996/01: Demande divisionnaire 95110136.9 déposée le 17/06/92 | Examination procedure | 04.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 08.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95110136.9 / EP0673088 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.03.1996
21.03.1996
ADMISSIBLE IMS Connector Systems GmbH Hauptstr. 52 79871 Eisenbach / DE Opponent's representative Weber, Otto-Ernst Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.03.1996
21.03.1996
ADMISSIBLE IMS Connector Systems GmbH Hauptstr. 52 79871 Eisenbach / DE Opponent's representative Weber, Otto-Ernst Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | 04.11.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.03.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.11.1997 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.11.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.06.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0419938 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]); | [A]EP0041023 (RADIALL SA [FR]); | [A]US4743205 (MITANI IKUJIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US5011415 (SUZUKI TAKAO [JP], et al); | [A]US3293592 (BLONDER ISAAC S) |