EP0519829 - Cloning and/or expressionvectors, preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC RORER S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron F-92160 Antony / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Xin-Jie Research School Biological Sciences Australia National University GPO Box 475 AU-Camberra ACT 2601 / AU | 02 /
Fleer, Reinhard 47 avenue Beauséjour F-91440 Bures sur Yvette / FR | 03 /
Fukuhara, Hiroshi, 160 avenue du Général Leclerc Résidence de Courcelles, Bât. 7 F-91190 Gif Sur Yvette / FR | [1992/52] | Representative(s) | Savina, Jacques, et al Aventis Pharma S.A. Direction des Brevets, Tri LEO/144 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | Savina, Jacques, et al Rhône-Poulenc Rorer S.A. Direction Brevets (t144) 20 avenue Raymond Aron F-92165 Antony Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401711.4 | 19.06.1992 | [1992/52] | Priority number, date | FR19910007640 | 21.06.1991 Original published format: FR 9107640 | [1992/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0519829 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/81 | [1992/52] | CPC: |
C12N15/815 (EP);
C07K14/545 (EP);
C07K14/765 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | PT [1992/52] | Title | German: | Klonierungs- und/oder Expressionsvektoren, Herstellung und Verwendung | [1992/52] | English: | Cloning and/or expressionvectors, preparation and use | [1992/52] | French: | Vecteurs de clonage et/ou d'expression préparation et utilisation | [1992/52] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 03.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/25] | 17.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2635115 ; | [A]EP0301670 | [XP] - JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY vol. 138, no. 2, February 1992, COLCHESTERUK pages 337 - 345 X.J. CHEN ET AL. 'Characterization of a circular plasmid from the yeast Kluyveromyces waltii' | [A] - CURRENT GENETICS vol. 19, no. 3, 1991, BERLINGERMANY pages 163 - 167 C. WILSON AND H. FUKUHARA 'Distribution of mitochondrial r1-type introns and the associated open reading frame in the yeast genus Kluyveromyces' |