EP0524847 - Process and apparatus for waste treatment by direct contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1997 [1997/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | For all designated states THIDE ENVIRONNEMENT 1 rue Fernand Raynaud 91199 Corbeil-Essonnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
For all designated states THIDE ENVIRONNEMENT 1 rue Fernand Raynaud F-91199 Corbeil-Essonnes / FR | |||
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Gérard 34 bis, avenue de Colmar F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | 02 /
Gaulard, Robert 30, avenue du Piple F-94370 Sussy en Brie / FR | [1993/04] | Application number, filing date | 92401828.6 | 26.06.1992 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | FR19910008717 | 09.07.1991 Original published format: FR 9108717 | [1993/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524847 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524847 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C10B53/00, C10L9/02 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
C10B49/06 (EP,US);
C10B53/00 (EP,US);
C10L9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abfallbehandlung durch direkten Kontakt | [1993/04] | English: | Process and apparatus for waste treatment by direct contact | [1993/04] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de traitement de déchets par contact direct | [1993/04] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 16.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2331752 (PICARD DU CHAMBON MICHEL [FR]); | [A]GB2106934 (COAL IND [GB]); | [X]DE3509275 (STILL CARL GMBH CO KG [DE]); | [A]EP0426925 (C G C ENTREPRISE SA [FR]) |