EP0527666 - Linen yarn wet production method and linen yarn so obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre Technique Industriel dit: INSTITUT TEXTILE DE FRANCE 280, avenue Aristide Briand B.P. 141 92223 Bagneux Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/07] | For all designated states Centre Technique Industriel dit: INSTITUT TEXTILE DE FRANCE 280, avenue Aristide Briand B.P. 141 F-92223 Bagneux Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mesnage, Philippe 17, rue du 19 mars 1962 F-62320 Rouvroy / FR | 02 /
Bruggeman, Jean-Pierre 20, avenue du Quennelet F-59650 Villeneuve D'Ascq / FR | 03 /
Ferrari, Marc 6, rue Charles Gounod F-60830 Crepy-en-Valois / FR | [1993/07] | Representative(s) | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre (Euralille) 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 37, rue du Vieux Faubourg F-59800 Lille / FR | ||
Former [1993/07] | Descourtieux, Philippe Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402158.7 | 27.07.1992 | [1993/07] | Priority number, date | FR19910010504 | 12.08.1991 Original published format: FR 9110504 | [1993/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0527666 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0527666 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D01B1/14, D01C1/00, D01B1/42 | [1993/07] | CPC: |
D01B1/42 (EP);
D01B1/14 (EP);
D01C1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/07] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren eines Leinengarnes nach der Nassbehandlungsmethode und so erhaltenes Leinengarn | [1993/07] | English: | Linen yarn wet production method and linen yarn so obtained | [1993/07] | French: | Procéde de fabrication d'un fil de lin au mouillé et fil de lin obtenu | [1993/07] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE533565 ; | [A]FR1053851 (SATIVA CORP); | [A]FR2115781 (TEXTILIPARI KUTATO INTEZ); | [Y]GB1431643 (STADLER HURTER INT LTD); | [A]FR2584103 (SERMI SA [FR]); | [A]FR2636350 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]) |