EP0526320 - Compression circuit for a gaseous fluid at a low pressure and temperature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.1996 [1996/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gistau-Baguer, Guy Chemin de la Buisse F-38330 Biviers / FR | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402160.3 | 27.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | FR19910009482 | 26.07.1991 Original published format: FR 9109482 | [1993/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0526320 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0526320 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F25J1/02, F25B9/10 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
F25B9/10 (EP,US);
F25J1/0007 (EP,US);
F25J1/0037 (EP,US);
F25J1/004 (EP,US);
F25J1/0042 (EP,US);
F25J1/0065 (EP,US);
F25J1/0202 (EP,US);
F25J1/0276 (EP,US);
F25J1/0292 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1993/05] | Title | German: | Kompressionskreislauf eines Gasfluidums bei niedrigem Druck und Temperatur | [1993/05] | English: | Compression circuit for a gaseous fluid at a low pressure and temperature | [1993/05] | French: | Circuit de compression d'un fluide gazeux à basse pression et à basse température | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3092976 (HADI HASHEMI-TAFRESHI); | [A]US4910972 (JASTER HEINZ [US]) |