EP0533589 - A semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Junji, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | 02 /
Takita, Masato, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402587.7 | 21.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | JP19910241045 | 20.09.1991 Original published format: JP 24104591 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533589 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533589 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495, H01L23/50 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
H01L24/06 (EP,US);
H01L23/50 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/4951 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05554 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05624 (EP,US);
H01L2224/06136 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4813 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4826 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48624 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49175 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73215 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1815 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19107 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30107 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05624, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00015 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/4826, H01L2224/49175, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48624, H01L2924/00, H01L2224/4826, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49175, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73215, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/4826, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/12] | Title | German: | Halbleitervorrichtung | [1993/12] | English: | A semiconductor device | [1993/12] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 03.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0198194 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0204177 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0295459 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4951122 (TSUBOSAKI KUNIHIRO [JP], et al) |