EP0538093 - Streamlined windscreen wiper, in particular for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.06.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE 11, rue Faraday 78180 Montigny-Le-Bretonneux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE 11, rue Faraday F-78180 Montigny-Le-Bretonneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raymond, Bernard 23 rue Cavendish F-75019 Paris / FR | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | ||
Former [1993/16] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services, Service Propriété Industrielle, "Le Triangle", 15, rue des Rosiers F-93585 Saint-Ouen Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402712.1 | 05.10.1992 | [1993/16] | Priority number, date | FR19910012624 | 14.10.1991 Original published format: FR 9112624 | [1993/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0538093 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/04, B60S1/32 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
B60S1/32 (EP);
B60S1/3801 (EP);
B60S2001/3813 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1993/16] | Title | German: | Verkleideter Scheibenwischer, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeug | [1993/16] | English: | Streamlined windscreen wiper, in particular for motor vehicle | [1993/16] | French: | Essuie-glace caréné, notamment pour véhicule automobile | [1993/16] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 30.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/33] | 23.03.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/33] | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2652325 ; | [AD]EP0280149 |