EP0538125 - Process for the preparation of crisp reconstituted pieces of potatoes and food products obtained according to this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE DEVELOPPEMENT INDUSTRIEL AGRO ALIMENTAIRE Montigny-Lengrain F-02290 Vic sur Aisne / FR | [1993/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tricoit, Jean 7 rue Léon Caillez F-02200 Soissons / FR | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Lanceplaine, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | Lanceplaine, Jean-Claude, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402810.3 | 14.10.1992 | [1993/16] | Priority number, date | FR19910012773 | 16.10.1991 Original published format: FR 9112773 | [1993/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0538125 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0538125 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0538125 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/217 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
A23L19/19 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Zubereitung von knusprigen wiederhergestellten Stücken von Kartoffeln und gemäss diesem Verfahren erhaltene Nahrungsmittelprodukte | [1993/16] | English: | Process for the preparation of crisp reconstituted pieces of potatoes and food products obtained according to this process | [1993/16] | French: | Procédé de préparation de morceaux croustillants reconstitués de pommes de terre et produits alimentaires obtenus selon ce procédé | [1993/16] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.1997 | ES | 30.07.1997 | SE | 30.10.1997 | CH | 31.10.1997 | LI | 31.10.1997 | PT | 05.11.1997 | [2002/25] |
Former [1998/50] | AT | 30.07.1997 | |
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
PT | 05.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/24] | AT | 30.07.1997 | |
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
PT | 05.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 30.07.1997 | |
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 30.10.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0398548 ; | [A]JPS60168361 ; | [A]EP0299755 (NABISCO BRANDS INC [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910717), vol. 015, no. 282, Database accession no. (C - 850)<4810>, & JP03098548 A 19910424 (LOTTE CO LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860118), vol. 010, no. 013, Database accession no. (C - 323)<2070>, & JP60168361 A 19850831 (LOTTE KK) |