EP0541426 - Non-swelling trioctanedral 2:1 phyllosilicates and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joly, Jean-François 20, rue Béranger F-75003 Paris / FR | 02 /
Huve, Laurent 96, rue de Belfort F-68200 Mulhouse / FR | 03 /
Lhommede, François 37, rue Saint Jacques F-44190 Clisson / FR | 04 /
Ledred, Ronan 8, rue des Pyrénés F-68400 Riedisheim / FR | 05 /
Saehr, Daniel 19, rue de Jean Mermoz F-68400 Riedisheim / FR | 06 /
Baron, Jacques 6, rue de Bourgogne F-68100 Mulhouse / FR | [1993/19] | Application number, filing date | 92402949.9 | 30.10.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | FR19910013975 | 08.11.1991 Original published format: FR 9113975 | [1993/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541426 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0541426 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/20, C01B33/22 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
C01B33/405 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1993/19] | Title | German: | Nicht-quellbare trioktaedrische 2:1 Phyllosilikate und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1993/19] | English: | Non-swelling trioctanedral 2:1 phyllosilicates and process for their preparation | [1993/19] | French: | Phyllosilicates 2:1 trioctaédriques non gonflants et leur procédé de préparation | [1993/19] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3115113 ; | [A]EP0088372 ; | [A]FR2349541 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 14, Avril 1988, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 115159z, TORII, K. AND IWASAKI, T. 'PREPARATION OF SWELLING SAPONITE-TYPE SMECTITE SILICATES' page 162 ; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 110, no. 10, Mars 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 78724, TORII, K. AND IWASAKI, T 'POROUS ARTICLES STRUCTURALLY SIMILAR TO THREE OCTAHEDRON-TYPE SMECTITE' page 189 ; | [A] - CHEMISTRY LETTERS (THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN) no. 12, 1986, TOKYO pages 2021 - 2024 TORII, K. ET IWASAKI, T. 'SYNTHESIS OF NEW TRIOCTAHEDRAL MG-SMECTITE' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 306 (C-856)6 Août 1991 ( AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY ) 16 Mai 1991 & JP-A-3 115 113, & JP3115113 A 00000000 | Examination | JP62292616 | JP63185811 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 14, Avril 1988, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 115159z, TORII, K. AND IWASAKI, T. 'PREPARATION OF SWELLING SAPONITE-TYPE SMECTITE SILICATES' page 162; & JP-A-62 292 616 (AGENCY OF IND. SCIENCE AND TECHN.), & JP62292616 A 00000000 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 110, no. 10, Mars 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 78724, TORII, K. AND IWASAKI, T 'POROUS ARTICLES STRUCTURALLY SIMILAR TO THREE OCTAHEDRON-TYPE SMECTITE' page 189; & JP-A-63 185 811 (AGENCY OF IND. SCIENCE AND TECHN.), & JP63185811 A 00000000 |