EP0512929 - Base frame for electrical box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states MERLIN GERIN 2, chemin des Sources F-38240 Meylan / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pellicano, Joseph Merlin Gerin, Sce.Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
Balaud, Philippe Merlin Gerin, Sce.Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | [1992/46] | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard, et al Schneider Electric SA Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Hecke, Gérard, et al Schneider Electric SA, Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1993/18] | Hecke, Gérard Merlin Gérin, Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR | ||
Former [1992/46] | Kern, Paul Merlin Gerin Sce. Brevets F-38050 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92420138.7 | 24.04.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | FR19910005548 | 29.04.1991 Original published format: FR 9105548 | [1992/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512929 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512929 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/30, H02B1/40 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
H02B1/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/46] | Title | German: | Bodenrahmen für elektrischen Kasten | [1992/46] | English: | Base frame for electrical box | [1992/46] | French: | Rehaussé pour coffret électrique | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 23.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.12.1995 | IT | 06.12.1995 | NL | 06.12.1995 | BE | 30.04.1996 | CH | 30.04.1996 | LI | 30.04.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | GB | 06.12.1995 | |
IT | 06.12.1995 | ||
NL | 06.12.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 06.12.1995 | |
IT | 06.12.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | GB | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 30.04.1996 | ||
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/24] | GB | 06.12.1995 | |
BE | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | GB | 06.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2715579 ; | [Y]GB1053352 ; | [A]US4255611 ; | [A]EP0028553 ; | [A]NL8403319 ; | [A]FR1496775 ; | [A]EP0281983 ; | [A]DE1753051 |