EP0522985 - Heat transfer tubes and method for manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.12.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI SHINDOH CO., LTD. No. 6-2, Ginza 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI SHINDOH CO., LTD. No. 6-2, Ginza 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masukawa, Seizo, c/o Wakamastsu Plant Mitsubishi Shindoh Co., Ltd., 128-7, Oogi-machi Aizuwakamatsu-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | 02 /
Sukumoda, Shunroku, c/o Wakamastsu Plant Mitsubishi Shindoh Co., Ltd., 128-7, Oogi-machi Aizuwakamatsu-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | [1996/51] |
Former [1993/02] | 01 /
Masukawa, Seizo, c/o Wakamastsu Plant Mitsubishi Shindoh Co., Ltd., 128-7, Oogi-machi Aizuwakamatsu-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Sukumoda, Shunroku, c/o Wakamastsu Plant Mitsubishi Shindoh Co., Ltd., 128-7, Oogi-machi Aizuwakamatsu-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1993/02] | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 F-69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92420232.8 | 08.07.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | JP19910168516 | 09.07.1991 Original published format: JP 16851691 | JP19920074463 | 30.03.1992 Original published format: JP 7446392 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522985 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522985 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0522985 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F28F13/18, F28D15/02, B21C37/20 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
F28F13/187 (EP,US);
B21C37/202 (EP,US);
F28D15/046 (EP,US);
F28F1/40 (EP,US);
F28F17/005 (EP,US);
F28F2200/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1993/02] | Title | German: | Wärmeaustauschrohre und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1993/02] | English: | Heat transfer tubes and method for manufacturing | [1993/02] | French: | Tubes de transfert de chaleur et méthode de fabrication | [1993/02] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 11.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE Wieland-Werke AG D-89070 Ulm / DE | [1997/45] | 20.10.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.04.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.04.1998 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1998 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 21.04.1999 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.04.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.05.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.05.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.12.1999 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62037693 ; | [Y]JP61175485 ; | [A]JP02161291 ; | [A]JP62062194 ; | [A]JP02075427 ; | [A]JP02165875 ; | [A]JP58058929 ; | [A]US4313248 (FUJIKAKE JUN); | [A]US4715433 (SCHWARZ ALEXANDER [US], et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 221 (M-608)17 July 1987 & JP-A-62 037 693 ( MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD ) 18 February 1987, & JP62037693 A 19870218 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 385 (M-548)24 December 1986 & JP-A-61 175 485 ( KOBE STEEL LTD ) 7 August 1986, & JP61175485 A 19860807 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 418 (M-1022)10 September 1990 & JP-A-02 161 291 ( FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD ) 21 June 1990, & JP02161291 A 19900621 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 255 (M-617)19 August 1987 & JP-A-62 062 194 ( KOBE STEEL LTD ) 18 March 1987, & JP62062194 A 19870318 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 262 (M-981)6 June 1990 & JP-A-02 075 427 ( FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD ) 15 March 1990, & JP02075427 A 19900315 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 420 (M-1023)11 September 1990 & JP-A-02 165 875 ( FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD ) 26 June 1990, & JP02165875 A 19900626 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 149 (M-225)30 June 1983 & JP-A-58 058 929 ( DAIKIN KOGYO KK ) 7 April 1983, & JP58058929 A 19830407 |