EP0524897 - Plastic tube head with barrier effect inner layer and part forming this layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEBAL S.A. 98, boulevard Victor Hugo 92115 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states CEBAL S.A. 98, boulevard Victor Hugo F-92115 Clichy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jupin, Alain 19 rue des Rondes F-51800 Sainte Menehould / FR | 02 /
Chapet, Gérard 23, rue Biot F-75017 Paris / FR | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Vanlaer, Marcel, et al PECHINEY Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cédex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Vanlaer, Marcel, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cédex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92420250.0 | 23.07.1992 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | FR19910009689 | 25.07.1991 Original published format: FR 9109689 | [1993/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524897 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524897 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D35/14 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
B65D35/14 (EP,US);
B29C43/42 (EP,US);
B29L2001/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1379 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1383 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31732 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31736 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31743 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3175 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/04] | Title | German: | Tubenkopf aus Kunststoff mit Innenverkleidung für eine Sperrwirkung und Gegenstand für diese Verkleidung | [1993/04] | English: | Plastic tube head with barrier effect inner layer and part forming this layer | [1993/04] | French: | Tête de tube en matière plastique à revêtement intérieur à effet barrière et pièce utilisable pour ce revêtement | [1993/04] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 05.03.1993 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1993 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40] | Request for further processing for: | 10.02.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.02.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE666719 ; | [AD]EP0130239 (AUTOMATION INDUSTRIELLE SA [CH]); | [A]AU545604B (AMERICAN CAN CO); | [AD]EP0315554 (CEBAL [FR]) |