EP0526361 - High performance electrode wire for electric discharge machining and process for preparing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TREFIMETAUX 11 bis, rue de l'Hôtel de Ville 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states TREFIMETAUX 11 bis, rue de l'Hôtel de Ville F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Negrerie, Marcel 35 bis, rue de la Fontaine F-95250 Cormeilles-en-Parisis / FR | 02 /
Leterrible, Pascal 6, rue des Frères Planquais F-27140 Gisors / FR | 03 /
Voirin, Anne 20, rue de Normandie F-27200 Vernon / FR | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Mougeot, Jean-Claude, et al Alcan France S.A.S. Propriété Industrielle 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Mougeot, Jean-Claude, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [1993/05] | Jacquet, Michel, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92420257.5 | 30.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | FR19910010103 | 02.08.1991 Original published format: FR 9110103 | [1993/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0526361 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0526361 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23H7/08 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
B23H7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1993/05] | Title | German: | Hochleistungsdrahtelektrode für Funkerosionsbearbeitung und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben | [1993/05] | English: | High performance electrode wire for electric discharge machining and process for preparing same | [1993/05] | French: | Electrode en alliage de cuivre à hautes performances pour usinage par électro érosion et procédé de fabrication | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 14.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE Berkenhoff GmbH Berkenhoffstr. 14 D- 35452 Heuchelheim / DE Opponent's representative Missling, Arne Böck Tappe Kollegen Ludwigsplatz 9 35390 Giessen / DE | [1996/37] | 31.07.1996 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 22.08.1996 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 05.09.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.02.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.03.1997 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1997 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 05.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.02.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.03.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 03.07.2002 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/35] | Appeal following opposition | 17.05.1999 | Appeal received No. T0556/99 | 06.07.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.07.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61103731 ; | [A]JP61136733 ; | [X]EP0185492 ; | [A]EP0312674 ; | [A]US4977303 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 286 (M-521)27 Septembre 1986 & JP-A-61 103 731 ( SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND. LTD. ) 22 Mai 1986, & JP61103731 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 333 (M-534)12 Novembre 1986 & JP-A-61 136 733 ( FUJIKURA LTD. ) 24 Juin 1986, & JP61136733 A 00000000 |