EP0550358 - Fault tolerant multiprocessor cluster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATEX PUBLISHING SYSTEMS CORPORATION 15 Crosby Drive Bedford Massachusetts 07130 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states ATEX PUBLISHING SYSTEMS CORPORATION 15 Crosby Drive Bedford, Massachusetts 07130 / US | ||
Former [1993/27] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vinther, Gordon A., c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Brudevold, Finn, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 D-82049 Pullach / DE | ||
Former [1993/27] | Buff, Michel Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92420481.1 | 23.12.1992 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | US19910813752 | 30.12.1991 Original published format: US 813752 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0550358 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0550358 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F15/16, G06F11/00, G06F11/18 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
G06F11/1604 (EP);
G06F11/1666 (EP);
G06F9/52 (EP);
G11C29/88 (EP);
G06F11/1044 (EP);
G06F11/1679 (EP);
G06F11/184 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/27] | G06F9/46, G06F15/16, G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/27] | Title | German: | Fehlertoleranter Multiprozessorverbund | [1993/27] | English: | Fault tolerant multiprocessor cluster | [1993/27] | French: | Système multiprocesseur en grappe à tolérance de fautes | [1993/27] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/09] | 06.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.06.1995 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0447578 (TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED) [X] 1 * column 6, line 34 - column 7, line 22 * * column 8, line 15 - line 50 * * column 15, line 10 - column 17, line 41 * * column 38, line 1 - column 39, line 6 * * figures 1,18 * [A] 4,7,8; | [YA]EP0109602 (HITACHI) [Y] 10 * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 27; figures 4,5 * [A] 3 | [XAY] - D. P. SIEWIOREK, "Architecture of fault-tolerant computers: an historical perspective", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, NEW YORK US, (199112), vol. 79, no. 12, pages 1710 - 1734 [X] 1 * page 1725, column L, line 9 - column R, line 14; figure 16 * [A] 3 [Y] 2 | [YA] - M. J. IACOPONI, "Hardware assisted real-time rollback in the advanced fault-tolerant data processor", PROCEEDINGS IEEE/AIAA 10TH DIGITAL AVIONICS SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, 14 - 17 OCTOBER 1991, LOS ANGELES US, pages 269 - 274 [Y] 2 * figure 1 * * page 269, column R, line 32 - page 270, column L, line 16 * [A] 1 | [YA] - Y.-T. HSU, "On designing and evaluating a high reliability microcomputer system for real-time industry applications", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 1991 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING, 28 SEPTEMBER - 1 OCTOBER 1991, DEARBORN US, vol. II, pages 1734 - 1740 [Y] 10 * page 1735, column L, line 11 - line 49; figure 3 * [A] 3 |