EP0594914 - Preparation of a catalyst for the manufacture of polyethylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP CHEMICALS S.N.C. Tour Neptune la Défense 1, 20, Place de Seine 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states BP CHEMICALS S.N.C. Tour Neptune la Défense 1, 20, Place de Seine F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daine, Erick BP Chemicals S.N.C., BP NO 6 F-13117 Lavera / FR | 02 /
Speakman, John Gabriel BP Chemicals S.N.C., BP NO 6 F-13117 Lavera / FR | [1994/18] | Representative(s) | Preece, Michael, et al BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division Sunbury Research Centre Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | Preece, Michael, et al BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division Sunbury Research Centre Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92430032.0 | 26.10.1992 | [1994/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0594914 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F110/02, C08F4/651, C08F4/654 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/656 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1994/18] | Title | German: | Herstellung eines Katalysators zur Herstellung von Polyethylen | [1994/18] | English: | Preparation of a catalyst for the manufacture of polyethylene | [1994/18] | French: | Préparation d'un catalyseur pour la fabrication de polyéthylène | [1994/18] | File destroyed: | 10.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/31] | 03.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.12.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0453088 ; | [Y]GB2096623 ; | [A]EP0014523 ; | [A]US4100105 |