EP0499557 - Compact cast iron burner of the total premix type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DE DIETRICH THERMIQUE 2 rue Clémenceau F-67110 Niederbronn-les-Bains / FR | [1992/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuhlhaber, Michel 5 rue des Eglantiers F-67110 Reichshoffen / FR | 02 /
Weitz, Philippe 10 rue des Primevères F-67110 Reichshoffen / FR | 03 /
Paradis, Marcel 1 rue Osterhardt F-67580 Mertzwiller / FR | [1992/34] | Representative(s) | Metz, Paul Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | Metz, Paul CABINET METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau B.P. 63 F-67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92440014.6 | 07.02.1992 | [1992/34] | Priority number, date | FR19910001573 | 07.02.1991 Original published format: FR 9101573 | [1992/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499557 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0499557 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/36, F23D14/30 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
F23D14/30 (EP);
F23D14/36 (EP);
F24H1/32 (EP);
F24H8/00 (EP);
F24H9/1836 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1992/34] | Title | German: | Kompakter gusseiserner Brenner vom total vormischenden Typ | [1994/17] | English: | Compact cast iron burner of the total premix type | [1992/34] | French: | Brûleur compact en fonte du type à prémélange total | [1992/34] |
Former [1992/34] | Kompakter gusseiserner Brenner von total vormischenden Typ | Examination procedure | 09.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.04.1994 | [1995/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0255472 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) |