EP0553586 - Composition of lead-free crystal glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE DES CRISTALLERIES DE BACCARAT BP.31 F-54120 Baccarat / FR | [1993/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornier, Gérard 390 Chemin des Grandes Royes F-88100 Sainte Marguerite / FR | 02 /
Vasseur, Daniel 5 Avenue Général Rouvillois F-54120 Baccarat / FR | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Bossard, Jacques-René Meyer & Partenaires Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Bureaux Europe 20, place des Halles 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Bossard, Jacques-René Meyer & Partenaires Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Bureaux Europe 20, place des Halles F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 92440024.5 | 19.02.1992 | [1993/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0553586 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0553586 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/078 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
C03C3/078 (EP);
C03C4/0028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/31] | Title | German: | Bleifreie Kristallglaszusammensetzung | [1993/31] | English: | Composition of lead-free crystal glass | [1993/31] | French: | Compositions de cristal sans plomb | [1993/31] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1992 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.02.1992 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 24.11.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63169601 ; | [X]DE1050965 ; | [A]AT346006B (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 26, 30 December 1985, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 219789T, page 284 ;column R ; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 110, no. 2, 9 January 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 12366B, page 259 ;column R ; & JP-A-63 169 601 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) 13.7.1988, & JP63169601 A 19890109 | Examination | JP60122747 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 26, 30 December 1985, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 219789T, page 284 ;column R ; & JP-A-60 122 747 (OHARA OPTICAL GLASS MFG CO LTD) 1.7.1985, & JP60122747 A 19851230 |