EP0575681 - Exhaust hood with extendable inlet tube and a filtering inlet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.1996 [1996/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE POUR L'EQUIPEMENT MENAGER "CEPEM" 18 rue du 11 Octobre F-45140 St Jean-de-la-Ruelle / FR | [1994/22] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states DE DIETRICH EUROPEENNE D'ELECTROMENAGER 57 rue de la Gare F-67580 Mertzwiller / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baldauff, Christian 35 rue principale F-67580 Mietesheim / FR | 02 /
Bec, Jean-Pierre 1a rue Stiegelmann F-67500 Haguenau / FR | 03 /
Redelsperger, Christian 18 rue du Château d'Eau F-67580 Mertzwiller / FR | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Benoit, Monique, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | Benoit, Monique, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1994/22] | Chaverneff, Vladimir THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1993/52] | Metz, Paul CABINET METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau B.P. 63 F-67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92440083.1 | 09.07.1992 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | FR19920008074 | 26.06.1992 Original published format: FR 9208074 | [1993/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575681 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/20, B08B15/02 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
F24C15/2085 (EP);
B08B15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1993/52] | Title | German: | Absaughaube mit einem ausziehbaren Einlassrohr und Filtereintritt | [1993/52] | English: | Exhaust hood with extendable inlet tube and a filtering inlet | [1993/52] | French: | Hotte à tube d'aspiration extensible et à bouche filtrante d'extrémité | [1993/52] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 18.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 01.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/31] | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]FR2671498 ; | [A]FR2575681 ; | [A]DE3920558 ; | [A]FR2221914 ; | [A]GB1139972 |