EP0536071 - Haymaking machine, especially a crop tedder, with at least two work positions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques F-67700 Saverne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aron, Jérôme 12, rue de la Forêt F-67330 Dossenheim sur Zinsel / FR | [1993/14] | Representative(s) | Andres, Jean-Claude KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Andres, Jean-Claude KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques F-67700 Saverne / FR | Application number, filing date | 92440111.0 | 02.10.1992 | [1993/14] | Priority number, date | FR19910012396 | 04.10.1991 Original published format: FR 9112396 | [1993/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0536071 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0536071 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01D78/10, B60B33/02 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
B60B33/028 (EP);
A01D78/1042 (EP);
A01D78/1071 (EP);
A01D78/1092 (EP);
B60B33/025 (EP);
B60B2200/22 (EP);
B60B33/0039 (EP);
B60B33/0049 (EP);
B60B33/0057 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR, IT, NL [1993/14] | Title | German: | Heuwerbungsmaschine, insb. ein Zetter für Pflanzengut, mit zumindest zwei Arbeitsstellungen | [1993/14] | English: | Haymaking machine, especially a crop tedder, with at least two work positions | [1993/14] | French: | Machine de fenaison, notamment une faneuse de végétaux, avec au moins deux positions de travail | [1993/14] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 21.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1482149 (PATENT CONCERN NV); | [A]US3910019 (SCHLITTLER JACQUES ROBY); | [A]FR2379244 (TEXAS INDUSTRIES INC [NL]); | [A]GB2041205 (SPERRY NV); | [A]US4246677 (DOWNING JOE R, et al); | [A]GB2065438 (LELY NV C VAN DER); | [Y]US4280246 (CHRISTENSEN CARL O); | [Y]FR2550687 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]); | [A]US4641491 (VAN DER LELY EDWIN [NL], et al); | [A]DE8807385U ; | [A]FR2631208 (KUHN SA [FR]); | [A]DE9010685U ; | [A]EP0439067 (FELLA WERKE GMBH [DE]) | [A] - S. HILDEBRAND 'FEINMECHANISCHE BAUELEMENTE' , VEB VERLAG TECHNIK , BERLIN |