EP0499559 - Procedure and apparatus for the non-destructive control of composite material containers by holographic interferometry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [1998/26] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | ||
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE Société Anonyme dite: 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouteyre, Jacques 31 rue Gustave Gaillard F-33160 Saint Medard en Jalles / FR | [1992/34] | Representative(s) | Thébault, Jean-Louis SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | Thébault, Jean-Louis Cabinet Thébault S.A. 1 Allées de Chartres F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 92450001.0 | 07.02.1992 | [1992/34] | Priority number, date | FR19910001982 | 13.02.1991 Original published format: FR 9101982 | [1992/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499559 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0499559 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/021, G01B11/16 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
G01B11/164 (EP,US);
F17C1/06 (EP,US);
G01B9/021 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0604 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0624 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0636 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0673 (EP,US);
F17C2209/2154 (EP,US);
F17C2221/031 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1992/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur zerstörungsfreien Kontrolle von Verbundmaterialräumen mittels holographischer Interferometrie | [1992/34] | English: | Procedure and apparatus for the non-destructive control of composite material containers by holographic interferometry | [1992/34] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de contrôle non-destructif par interféromètre holographique d'enceintes en matériau composite | [1992/34] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 10.10.1994 | Appeal received No. T0854/94 | 22.10.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.10.1996 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1996/43] | 27.12.1996 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1996/52] | 18.02.1997 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1997/08] | 17.04.1997 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1997/16] | 04.06.1997 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1997/23] | 26.07.1997 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1997/30] | 13.11.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.06.1998 | NL | 24.06.1998 | LU | 07.02.1999 | CH | 28.02.1999 | LI | 28.02.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 24.06.1998 | |
NL | 24.06.1998 | ||
CH | 28.02.1999 | ||
LI | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 24.06.1998 | |
CH | 28.02.1999 | ||
LI | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 24.06.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2048189 (COOPTRONICS INC); | [A]US3644047 (BROWN GORDON M, et al); | [A]US3681970 (WELLS DONALD R); | [A]US3711202 (RUSH H, et al); | [A]US3938889 (MCKINNIS JAMES A); | [A]US3976380 (ROTTENKOLBER HANS, et al); | [A]GB2018455 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER); | [A]GB2021802 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [A]US4506981 (HOFF JR CHARLES M [US]) | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS. vol. 21, no. 20, Octobre 1982, NEW YORK US WAGNER ET AL.: 'USING OPTICAL CORRELATION TO MEASURE LEAK RATES IN SEALED PACKAGES.' |