EP0518798 - Compositions for use in the treatment of aphtous ulcers and other mucocutaneous disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEMEX/BLOCK DRUG, JV 257 Cornelison Avenue Jersey City, NJ 07302 / US | [1992/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vora, Kabubhai Rashmi 924, Pennsylvania Avenue Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 02 /
Khandwala, Atul 1055 River Road, Unit 310 Edgewater, NJ 07024 / US | 03 /
Smith, Charles G. 17323 Circa-Del Sur Rancho, Sante Fe, CA 92067 / US | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17, avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Michel Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17 Avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1993/26] | Poupon, Michel B.P. 421 3, rue Ferdinand Brunot F-88011 Epinal Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1992/51] | Poupon, Michel B.P. 421 3, rue Ferdinand Brunot F-88011 Epinal Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92470014.9 | 09.04.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | US19910682347 | 09.04.1991 Original published format: US 682347 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0518798 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0518798 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/33, A61K31/00 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP);
A61K31/12 (EP);
A61K31/20 (EP);
A61K31/34 (EP);
A61K31/35 (EP);
A61K31/365 (EP);
A61K31/37 (EP);
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K31/41 (EP);
A61K31/415 (EP);
A61K31/425 (EP);
A61K31/436 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/495 (EP);
A61K31/505 (EP);
A61K31/55 (EP);
A61K31/557 (EP);
A61K31/685 (EP);
A61K38/04 (EP);
A61K8/36 (EP);
A61K8/361 (EP);
A61K8/365 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/46 (EP);
A61K8/49 (EP);
A61K8/4913 (EP);
A61K8/4926 (EP);
A61K8/494 (EP);
A61K8/496 (EP);
A61K8/4973 (EP);
A61K8/498 (EP);
A61K9/006 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1992/51] | A61K31/33 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/51] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung von aphtösen Ulcera und anderen mucokutanösen Störungen | [1992/51] | English: | Compositions for use in the treatment of aphtous ulcers and other mucocutaneous disorders | [1992/51] | French: | Compositions pour le traitement d'ulcers aphteux et d'autres maladies mucocutaneuses | [1992/51] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/43: Teilanmeldung 97202524.1 eingereicht am 15/08/97 | EPB 1997/43: Divisional application 97202524.1 filed on 15/08/97 | EPB 1997/43: Demande divisionnaire 97202524.1 déposée le 15/08/97 | Examination procedure | 14.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/46] | 11.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/46] | Divisional application(s) | EP97202524.1 / EP0836852 | EP97470020.5 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 13.09.1997 | Request for further processing for: | 16.06.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 16.06.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 20.11.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 14.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4228173 (CAIRNS HUGH, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 14 *[Y] 4,14-20; | [XY]WO9009989 (ROTTA RESEARCH LAB [IT]) [X] 1,3 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 4,14-20; | [X]EP0416925 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,14,15 * page 3, line 16 - line 37 * * page 4, line 20 - line 58 * | [X] - CHARITY C. FOX ET AL., "Modulation of mediator release from human intestinal mast cells by sulfasalazine and 5-aminosalicylic acid", DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, (199102), vol. 36, no. 2, pages 179 - 184 [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [Y] - A.KHANDWALA ET AL., "RHC 3288 (1_mwthyl-2(1,3,4-oxadiazol-2(3H)-one-5-yl)benzimidazole) and related compounds", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (1983), vol. 32, no. 22, pages 3325 - 3333 [Y] 4 * abstract * * page 3325, column L * | [Y] - PAUL SIMINOFF ET AL., "BL-5255 inhibits mediator release from mast cells and phosphodiesterase activity", INT.J.IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1982), vol. 4, no. 4, page 343 [Y] 4 |