EP0514308 - Underlayer doping in thin film magnetic recording media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edmonson, David Alvoid 807 1st Street N.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55901 / US | 02 /
Johnson, Kenneth Edmund 1111 Audaz Lane S.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55902 / US | 03 /
Mayerle, James Joseph 1637 Camelback Court N.E. Rochester, Minnesota 55906 / US | 04 /
Wall, Arthur Carl 4117 Villa Road N.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55901 / US | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1992/47] | Vekemans, André Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 92480064.2 | 30.04.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | US19910700010 | 14.05.1991 Original published format: US 700010 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514308 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/64 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
C23C14/34 (KR);
G11B5/736 (KR);
G11B5/7373 (EP,US);
G11B5/73913 (EP,US);
G11B5/82 (KR);
G11B5/851 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/47] | Title | German: | Dotieren von Unterschichten bei magnetischen Dünnfilmaufzeichnungsträgern | [1992/47] | English: | Underlayer doping in thin film magnetic recording media | [1992/47] | French: | Dopage de sous-couches dans les milieux d'enregistrements magnétiques de films minces | [1992/47] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/46] | 24.06.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0298840 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]DE4023770 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |