EP0536074 - Method for determining the inheritance and propagation of object attribute values [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torres, Robert J. 6100 Meadowhill Drive Colleyville, TX 76034 / US | [1993/14] | Representative(s) | de Pena, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | de Pena, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 92480120.2 | 28.08.1992 | [1993/14] | Priority number, date | US19910771280 | 03.10.1991 Original published format: US 771280 | [1993/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0536074 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0536074 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
G06F9/4492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Vererbung und Propagierung von Objektattributwerten | [1993/14] | English: | Method for determining the inheritance and propagation of object attribute values | [1993/14] | French: | Méthode pour déterminer l'hérédité et la propagation de valeurs d'attributs d'objets | [1993/14] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 04.07.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - E. EBEL ET AL 'Das grose Buch zu WORD für Windows' 1990 , DATA BECKER , DüSSELDORF, GERMANY |