EP0546977 - Method and apparatus for solving numerical problems that use a plurality of processing elements operating in parallel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cunto, Walter Biagio, Los Samanes Calle 4 y 7, Quinta Chez Moi, Municipio baruta Estado Miranda, Caracas 1060 / VE | 02 /
Goncalves, Jorge Humberto, Calle Ppal del Toronjil Qta. TERE, Urb. El Toronjil San Antonio de los Altos, 1204 Miranda / VE | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 92480168.1 | 05.11.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | US19910808320 | 13.12.1991 Original published format: US 808320 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0546977 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0546977 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/31, G06F15/32, G06F7/552 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
G06F7/5525 (EP,US);
G06F17/10 (EP,US);
G06F2207/5523 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/24] | G06F15/31 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Lösung numerischer Probleme unter Verwendung mehreren parallel arbeitenden Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtungen | [1993/24] | English: | Method and apparatus for solving numerical problems that use a plurality of processing elements operating in parallel | [1993/24] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour résoudre des problèmes numériques utilisant plusieurs éléments de traitement de données travaillant en parallèle | [1993/24] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 15.10.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - J. HERZBERGER, "Über ein Verfahren zur Bestimung reeller Nullstellen mit Anwendung auf Parallelrechnung", ELEKTRONISCHE RECHENANLAGEN - MIT COMPUTER PRAXIS, MUNCHEN DE, (197212), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 250 - 254 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - R. K. KIRKMAN, "Numeric Value Determination", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (197710), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 1913 - 1915 |