EP0546980 - Hook-up device for trailers and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanchis Font, Gonzalo C. Badajoz, 112 E-08018 Barcelona / ES | [1993/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Ponti Sales, Adelaida Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [1993/24] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida C. Consell de Cent, 322 E-08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 92500164.6 | 10.12.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | ES19910003763 | 13.12.1991 Original published format: ES 9103763 | [1993/24] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546980 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/52 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
B60D1/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/24] | Title | German: | Einhängevorrichtung für Schlepper und dergleichen | [1993/24] | English: | Hook-up device for trailers and the like | [1993/24] | French: | Dispositif d'accrochage pour remorques et similaires | [1993/24] | File destroyed: | 21.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/33] | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0310204 ; | [Y]EP0301153 ; | [A]WO8403666 ; | [A]EP0151099 |