EP0569654 - Compound wood-aluminium profile member for windows, their manufacturing method, and windows made accordingly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meeth, Ernst Josef Josef-Meeth-Strasse 12-16 D-54531 Wallscheid / DE | [1993/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean OFFICE DENNEMEYER & ASSOCIATES Sàrl, P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | Waxweiler, Jean OFFICE DENNEMEYER & ASSOCIATES Sàrl, P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 92630052.6 | 12.05.1992 | [1993/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569654 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/30, E06B3/26 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
E06B3/06 (EP);
E06B3/303 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE [1993/46] | Title | German: | Alu-Holz-Verbundprofil für die Herstellung von Fenstern, daraus hergestelltes Fenster und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Fensters | [1993/46] | English: | Compound wood-aluminium profile member for windows, their manufacturing method, and windows made accordingly | [1993/46] | French: | Profilé mixte bois-aluminium pour fenêtres, ainsi que leur procédé de fabrication et fenêtres ainsi obtenues | [1993/46] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 03.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/24] | 13.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.1994 | 31.05.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2621489 ; | [X]FR2259223 ; | [X]GB2216580 ; | [X]DE1935118 ; | [X]FR2633970 ; | [X]EP0159458 ; | [X]BE717602 ; | [Y]FR2562143 ; | [Y]DE2842826 ; | [A]GB2011983 ; | [A]DE2555702 ; | [A]DE2245744 |