EP0530132 - Fastener with differentially inclined axes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VSI CORPORATION 300 West Service Road Chantilly Virginia 22021-9998 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states VSI CORPORATION 300 West Service Road Chantilly, Virginia 22021-9998 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zare-Ardestani, Vahid 2136 Saddleback Drive Corona, California 91719 / US | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 92630073.2 | 06.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | US19910751034 | 28.08.1991 Original published format: US 751034 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0530132 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0530132 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/04 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
F16B33/002 (EP,US);
F16B37/04 (EP,US);
F16B37/044 (EP,US);
F16B37/048 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49881 (EP,US);
Y10T403/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Befestigungselement mit unterschiedlich gerichteten Achsen | [1993/09] | English: | Fastener with differentially inclined axes | [1993/09] | French: | Elément de fixation avec axes inclinés différemment | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.04.1996 | BE | 03.04.1996 | CH | 03.04.1996 | DK | 03.04.1996 | ES | 03.04.1996 | GR | 03.04.1996 | LI | 03.04.1996 | IE | 06.08.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2001/05] | AT | 03.04.1996 | |
BE | 03.04.1996 | ||
CH | 03.04.1996 | ||
DK | 03.04.1996 | ||
GR | 03.04.1996 | ||
LI | 03.04.1996 | ||
IE | 06.08.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 03.04.1996 | |
BE | 03.04.1996 | ||
CH | 03.04.1996 | ||
DK | 03.04.1996 | ||
GR | 03.04.1996 | ||
LI | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 03.04.1996 | |
BE | 03.04.1996 | ||
CH | 03.04.1996 | ||
DK | 03.04.1996 | ||
LI | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 03.04.1996 | |
BE | 03.04.1996 | ||
CH | 03.04.1996 | ||
LI | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/20] | AT | 03.04.1996 | |
BE | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 03.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3219088 (ZAHODIAKIN VICTOR F); | [X]EP0062155 (HANS LICHTI DIPL ING HEINER LI [DE]); | [A]EP0297497 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]); | [Y]US5032047 (THEAKSTON HARRY A [US]) |