EP0548000 - Distributor type fuel injection pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STANADYNE AUTOMOTIVE CORP. 92 Deerfield Road Windsor Connecticut 06095 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states STANADYNE AUTOMOTIVE CORP. 92 Deerfield Road Windsor Connecticut 06095 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Djordjevic, Ilija 159 Kimberly Road East Granby, Connecticut 06026 / US | [1993/25] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 92630106.0 | 02.12.1992 | [1993/25] | Priority number, date | US19910803130 | 05.12.1991 Original published format: US 803130 | [1993/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0548000 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0548000 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548000 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F02M41/10, F02M59/36 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
F02M41/10 (EP,US);
F02M41/04 (KR);
F02M39/005 (EP,US);
F02M41/042 (EP,US);
F02M41/08 (EP,US);
F02M55/00 (EP,US);
F02M59/06 (EP,US);
F02M59/366 (EP,US);
F02M59/466 (EP,US);
F04B1/1071 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/25] | Title | German: | Verteilereinspritzpumpe | [1993/25] | English: | Distributor type fuel injection pump | [1993/25] | French: | Pompe à injection de combustible distributrice | [1993/25] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 01.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1053245 [ ] (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO); | BE430234 [ ] | Examination | DE3719833 | US4940036 | US4412519 | GB2096710 | US4920940 |