EP0500497 - Annular connectable ornament carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sperling, Gösta-Christian Zum Wald 16 D-78465 Konstanz / DE | [1992/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 CH-8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 92810106.2 | 17.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | CH19910000522 | 20.02.1991 Original published format: CH 52291 | CH19920000341 | 06.02.1992 Original published format: CH 34192 | [1992/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500497 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500497 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A44C11/02, A44C5/20 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
A44C15/00 (EP,US);
A44C5/00 (EP,US);
A44C5/2061 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3976 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3984 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/35] | Title | German: | Ringförmig verbindbarer Schmuckträger | [1992/35] | English: | Annular connectable ornament carrier | [1992/35] | French: | Appui annulaire pour ornementation à un élément de connexion | [1992/35] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 13.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1431729 (FISCHER MILTON A); | [X]US1451316 (BARNETT LYMAN R); | [A]EP0204313 (BRAUER DIETER PAUL) |