EP0517665 - Tensioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Widmer, Alfred Oberseenerstrasse 24 CH-8405 Winterthur / CH | [1992/50] | Application number, filing date | 92810412.4 | 27.05.1992 | [1992/50] | Priority number, date | CH19910001688 | 06.06.1991 Original published format: CH 168891 | [1992/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517665 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16B31/02 | [1992/50] | CPC: |
F16B31/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/50] | Title | German: | Spannvorrichtung | [1992/50] | English: | Tensioning device | [1992/50] | French: | Dispositif tendeur | [1992/50] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/44] | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1144465 ; | [A]US5020949 ; | [A]US4692075 |