EP0572752 - Method of production of a workpiece of thermoplastic composite material with a hole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SULZER INNOTEC AG Zürcherstrasse 12 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | [1994/27] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zürcherstrasse 12 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gysin, Hansjörg Loorstrasse 48 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Heubeck, Bernhard Sulzer Management AG KS Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Heubeck, Bernhard Sulzer Management AG, KS Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [1996/29] | Heubeck, Bernhard c/o Sulzer Management AG KS Patente/0007 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 92810433.0 | 04.06.1992 | [1993/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572752 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572752 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/00 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
B29C70/347 (EP);
B29C70/20 (EP);
B29C70/465 (EP);
B29C33/0033 (EP);
B29L2031/737 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/49] | B29C67/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Werkstücks mit einer Durchgangsöffnung aus thermoplastischem Verbundwerkstoff | [1993/49] | English: | Method of production of a workpiece of thermoplastic composite material with a hole | [1993/49] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une pièce en matériau composite thermoplastique avec un trou | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 30.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3056706 (KNOPPEL CURT A); | [A]DE3207573 (VER FOERDERUNG INST KUNSTSTOFF [DE]); | [Y]DE3805245 (ROBLON AS [DK]); | [AD]EP0398841 (SULZER AG [CH]) |