blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0520951

EP0520951 - Method and apparatus for recirculating flue gas in a pulse combuster [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  18.10.1996
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.1996Refusal of applicationpublished on 04.12.1996 [1996/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FULTON THERMATEC CORPORATION
Port & Jefferson Streets, Box 257
Pulaski, N.Y. 13142 / US
[1993/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Bramley Palm, R. Jr.
Road No 12 P.O. Box 10
Washington Blv. Oswego, New York 13126 / US
[1993/01]
Representative(s)Feldmann, Clarence Paul, et al
Schneider Feldmann AG
Patent- und Markenanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 49
Postfach
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1993/01]Feldmann, Clarence Paul, et al
c/o Patentanwaltsbüro FELDMANN AG Postfach Kanalstrasse 17
CH-8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Application number, filing date92810491.825.06.1992
[1993/01]
Priority number, dateUS1991072063325.06.1991         Original published format: US 720633
[1993/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0520951
Date:30.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/53]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0520951
Date:26.05.1993
Language:EN
[1993/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.1993
ClassificationIPC:F23C11/04, F23C9/00
[1993/01]
CPC:
F23C15/00 (EP,US); F23C9/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [1993/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Rauchgasrückführung bei einem Gerät mit pulsierender Verbrennung[1993/01]
English:Method and apparatus for recirculating flue gas in a pulse combuster[1993/01]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la recirculation du gaz de fumée dans un appareil à combustion pulsatoire[1993/01]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure09.03.1993Examination requested  [1993/20]
08.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.1996Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/49]
19.07.1996Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.199605   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP60248910  ;
 [A]US4995376  (HANSON GARRY O [US]);
 [AD]WO8200047  (BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]);
 [A]US4601654  (KITCHEN JOHN A [CA]);
 [A]EP0354188  (GAS RES INST [US])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 118 (M-475)(2175) 2 May 1986 & JP-A-60 248 910 ( TOSHIBA KK ) 9 December 1985, & JP60248910 A 19851209
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.