EP0528755 - Device for sucking up powders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frei, Siegfried Sammelbühlstrasse CH-9053 Teufen / CH | [1993/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 CH-8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 92810553.5 | 20.07.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | CH19910002416 | 16.08.1991 Original published format: CH 241691 | [1993/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528755 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65G53/42 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
B65G53/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1993/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Absaugen von Pulver | [1993/08] | English: | Device for sucking up powders | [1993/08] | French: | Dispositif d'aspiration de matières pulvérulantes | [1993/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 24.11.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0337132 ; | [Y]CH317731 ; | [Y]DE3920635 ; | [YD]EP0184994 ; | [A]FR2518969 ; | [A]DE1806774 |