EP0537109 - Bag package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alusuisse-Lonza Services AG Feldeggstrasse 4 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states ALUSUISSE-LONZA SERVICES AG Feldeggstrasse 4 CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schindler, Hans Hauentalstrasse 161 CH-8204 Schaffhausen / CH | 02 /
Christel, Andreas Durachweg 22 CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [1993/15] | Application number, filing date | 92810706.9 | 14.09.1992 | [1993/15] | Priority number, date | CH19910002856 | 25.09.1991 Original published format: CH 285691 | [1993/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0537109 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0537109 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58, B65D77/22, B65D81/34 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
B65D77/225 (EP);
B65D75/5855 (EP);
B65D81/3461 (EP);
B65D2581/3466 (EP);
B65D2581/3472 (EP);
B65D2581/3477 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/15] | Title | German: | Beutelverpackung | [1993/15] | English: | Bag package | [1993/15] | French: | Emballage en forme de sac | [1993/15] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/14] | 04.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3705591 ; | [A]FR2224365 ; | [A]DE3316065 ; | [A]EP0343629 ; | [A]DE1942966 |