EP0540467 - Stabilised epoxy resin compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.10.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hollstein, Werner, Dr. Im Hubhof 12 W-7800 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
Rüger, Peter Stallenmattstrasse 12 CH-4104 Oberwil / CH | 03 /
Rabener, Claus W., Dr. Schmiedackerstrasse 21 W-7858 Oetlingen / DE | [1993/18] | Application number, filing date | 92810806.7 | 20.10.1992 | [1993/18] | Priority number, date | CH19910003158 | 29.10.1991 Original published format: CH 315891 | [1993/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540467 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, C08K3/36, H01B3/40 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
C08G59/226 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
H01B3/40 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K9/04, C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C08L63/00, C08L2666/22 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/18] | Title | German: | Stabilisierte Epoxidharz-Zusammensetzungen | [1993/18] | English: | Stabilised epoxy resin compositions | [1993/18] | French: | Compositions de résines époxydes stabilisées | [1993/18] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/47] | 09.07.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0348193 (SOMAR CORP [JP]); | [YP]EP0459614 (SOMAR CORP [JP]); | [A]FR1442669 (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE); | [A]US4518631 (ANTONEN ROBERT C [US]); | [A]FR2182833 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) |