EP0551796 - Microcapsule suspension and a process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/29] | Microcapsules, a process for their preparation and their use | ||
[1997/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [1997/14] |
Former [1993/29] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lo, Chien-Cho 2602 Quaker Landing Road Greensboro, NC 27005 / US | [1993/29] | Application number, filing date | 92811017.0 | 22.12.1992 | [1993/29] | Priority number, date | US19920818029 | 03.01.1992 Original published format: US 818029 | [1993/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0551796 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0551796 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0551796 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/02, B01J13/16 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
B01J13/16 (EP,US);
B01J13/14 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1993/29] | B01J13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/27] |
Former [1993/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Suspension von Mikrokapseln und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1997/33] | English: | Microcapsule suspension and a process for its preparation | [1997/33] | French: | Suspension de microcapsules et procédé pour sa préparation | [1997/33] |
Former [1993/29] | Mikrokapseln, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihrer Anwendung | ||
Former [1993/29] | Microcapsules, a process for their preparation and their use | ||
Former [1993/29] | Microcapsules, procédé pour leur préparation et leur application | Examination procedure | 12.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 23.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60216839 ; | [AD]EP0017409 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [Y]FR2543019 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0278878 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1, no. 85 (C-336)4 April 1986 & JP-A-60 216 839 ( MITSUBISHI SEIKI ) 30 October 1985, & JP60216839 A 19851030 |