EP0506633 - Device driven by the opening of a domestic gas-oven to light interior thereof and for the contemporaneous safety of the electronic ignition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.1995 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMEG S.p.A. Via Circonvallazione Nord, 36 Guastalla (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [1992/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertazzoni, Roberto Via Maldotti, 2 Guastalla (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92830154.8 | 27.03.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI00260U | 27.03.1991 Original published format: IT MI910260 U | [1992/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0506633 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0506633 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F24C3/10, F24C15/00 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
F24C15/008 (EP);
F24C15/02 (EP);
F24C3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1992/40] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungs- und Zündsystem betätigt durch Öffnung einer Haushaltgasofen | [1992/40] | English: | Device driven by the opening of a domestic gas-oven to light interior thereof and for the contemporaneous safety of the electronic ignition | [1992/40] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage et d'allumage commandé par l'ouverture d'un four domestique à gaz | [1992/40] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/13] | 03.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1025122 ; | [Y]US3231732 ; | [A]DE1934239 ; | [A]US2655142 ; | [A]FR1452726 |