EP0575686 - CMOS logic circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CO.RI.M.ME. CONSORZIO PER LA RICERCA SULLA MICROELETTRONICA NEL MEZZOGIORNO Stradale Primosole, 50 95121 Catania / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states CO.RI.M.ME. CONSORZIO PER LA RICERCA SULLA MICROELETTRONICA NEL MEZZOGIORNO Stradale Primosole, 50 95121 Catania / IT | ||
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states CO.RI.M.ME. CONSORZIO PER LA RICERCA SULLA MICROELETTRONICA NEL MEZZOGIORNO Stradale Primosole, 50 I-95121 Catania / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imbruglia, Antonio Via Rosso di San Secondo, 14 I-95128 Catania / IT | 02 /
Benenati, Giovanni Via Pensavalle 18/9 I-9503 San Giovanni la Punta (CT) / IT | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1998/12] | Botti, Mario, et al Porta, Checcacci & Botti S.r.l. Viale Sabotino 19/2 20135 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1993/52] | Checcacci, Giorgio, et al PORTA, CHECCACCI & BOTTI s.r.l. Viale Sabotino, 19/2 I-20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92830269.4 | 27.05.1992 | [1993/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575686 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575686 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/0185 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
H03K19/018521 (EP,US);
H03K19/01855 (EP,US);
H03K19/018585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/52] | Title | German: | CMOS-Logikschaltung | [1993/52] | English: | CMOS logic circuit | [1993/52] | French: | Circuit logique CMOS | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 30.06.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 09.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 22.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59064916 ; | [A]JP1204520 ; | [A]US4032795 (HALE ROBERT R); | [A]GB2113934 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [A]US4472647 (ALLGOOD ROBERT N [US], et al); | [A]US4794282 (COLLES JOSEPH H [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 167 (E-258) (1604) 2 August 1984; & JP-A-59 064 916 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 13 April 1984, & JP59064916 A 19840413 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 507 (E-845) (3855) 14 November 1989; & JP-A-1 204 520 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) 17 August 1989, & JP1204520 A 19890817 | Examination | JPH01194608 | JPH0286323 | JPS58117729 | EP0438172 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891107), vol. 013, no. 490, Database accession no. (E - 841), & JP01194608 A 19890804 (HITACHI LTD) | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900613), vol. 014, no. 273, Database accession no. (E - 0940), & JP02086323 A 19900327 (FUJITSU LTD) | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831007), vol. 007, no. 226, Database accession no. (E - 202), & JP58117729 A 19830713 (FUJITSU KK) |