EP0520958 - Card for cotton and for similar uses, with fixed carding flats which form cleaning members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giuliani, Marcello Via Cellerese 33 I-50013 Campi Bisenzio Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states Giuliani, Marcello Via Cellerese 33 I-50013 Campi Bisenzio Firenze / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Gianfranco, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Mannucci, Gianfranco, Dott.-Ing., et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 I-50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 92830317.1 | 17.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | IT1991FI00158 | 25.06.1991 Original published format: IT FI910158 | [1993/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0520958 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520958 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/24, D01G15/80 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
D01G15/24 (EP,US);
D01G15/805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, PT [1993/01] | Title | German: | Karte für Baumwolle und für ähnlichen Gebrauch, mit feststehenden Deckeln, die Reinigungsbauteile aufweisen | [1993/01] | English: | Card for cotton and for similar uses, with fixed carding flats which form cleaning members | [1993/01] | French: | Carde pour coton et fibres similaires pourvue des chapeaux fixes constituant des membres nettoyants | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 09.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 07.05.1996 | [1998/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1278155 ; | [Y]EP0144607 (JACOBSON SVEN GUNNAR); | [X]EP0310964 (HOLLINGSWORTH GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0366918 (GRAF & CO AG [CH]); | [A]EP0431485 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) |