EP0574647 - Method and apparatus for producing bundels of folded polyethylene paper sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSCOCARTA S.p.A. Via per Coselli 45 I-55060 Capannori Fraz. di Coselli (Lucca) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states TOSCOCARTA S.p.A. Via per Coselli 45 I-55060 Capannori, Fraz. di Coselli (Lucca) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Papeschi, Goffredo Via del Cimitero 4 I-55012 Capannori(Lucca) Loc.Vorno / IT | [1996/35] |
Former [1993/51] | 01 /
Papeschi, Goffredo Via del Cimitero 4 I-55012 Capannori, Lucca, Loc.Vorno / IT | Representative(s) | Martini, Lazzaro Studio Brevetti Ing. Dr. Lazzaro Martini s.r.l. Via dei Rustici 5 50122 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | Martini, Lazzaro Studio Brevetti Ing. Dr. Lazzaro Martini s.r.l. Via dei Rustici 5 I-50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 92830324.7 | 19.06.1992 | [1993/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574647 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574647 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/22 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
B65H45/22 (EP);
B65H29/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Bündeln gefalteter Bögen aus Polyethylen-Papier | [1996/35] | English: | Method and apparatus for producing bundels of folded polyethylene paper sheets | [1993/51] | French: | procédé et appareil pour produire des paquets de feuilles de papier polyethylènepliées en deux | [1996/35] |
Former [1993/51] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Bündeln gefalteter Bogen aus Polyethylen-Papier | ||
Former [1993/51] | procédé et appareil pour produire des paquets de feuilles de papier polythène pliées en deux | Examination procedure | 22.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 09.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34] | Request for further processing for: | 05.01.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 05.01.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.08.1996 | DK | 28.08.1996 | ES | 28.08.1996 | GB | 28.08.1996 | NL | 28.08.1996 | PT | 28.11.1996 | SE | 28.11.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
DK | 28.08.1996 | ||
ES | 28.08.1996 | ||
GB | 28.08.1996 | ||
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
DK | 28.08.1996 | ||
GB | 28.08.1996 | ||
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/30] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
GB | 28.08.1996 | ||
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 28.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1056508 ; | [A]US4181069 (PORTER JAMES F [US]) |