EP0580923 - Device comprising an error amplifier, a control portion and a circuit for detecting voltage variations in relation to a set value [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/05] | Circuit for detecting voltage variations in relation to a set value, for devices comprising errors amplifiers | ||
[1996/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS s.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borgato, Pierandrea Via I Maggio, 6 I-22050 Lomagna / IT | 02 /
Diazzi, Claudio Via Lucano, 2 I-20135 Milano / IT | 03 /
Pidutti, Albino Via Joppi, 42 I-33100 Udine / IT | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Prato, Roberto, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | Prato, Roberto, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 92830428.6 | 30.07.1992 | [1994/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580923 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580923 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/156, H02M1/14 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
H02M3/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/05] | Title | German: | Steuerungsteil und Fehlerverstärker enthaltende Vorrichtung mit einer Schaltung zum Messen der auf einen Spannungssollwert bezogenen Spannungsschwankungen | [1996/49] | English: | Device comprising an error amplifier, a control portion and a circuit for detecting voltage variations in relation to a set value | [1996/49] | French: | Dispositif comprenant un amplificateur d'erreur, un élément de commande et un circuit pour la détection de variations de tension en relation avec une tension de référence | [1996/49] |
Former [1994/05] | Schaltung zum Messen der auf reinen Spannungssollwert bezogenen Spannungsschwankungen für Fehlerverstärker enthaltende Vorrichtungen | ||
Former [1994/05] | Circuit for detecting voltage variations in relation to a set value, for devices comprising errors amplifiers | ||
Former [1994/05] | Circuit pour la détection de variations de tension en relation avec une tension de référence pour dispositifs comprenant des amplifications d'erreurs | Examination procedure | 03.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU1350829 ; | [X]JP04015887 ; | [A]JP60247718 ; | [A]JP02181663 ; | [X]EP0123745 (IBM [US]); | [Y]WO8501621 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]EP0473925 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4204219 (UCHIDA TOMOAKI [JP]); | [A]US4701720 (MONTICELLI DENNIS M [US]); | [A]EP0369118 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]); | [A]EP0431778 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [X] - SOVIET PATENTS ABSTRACTS Section EI, Week 198822, 2 June 1988 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class U22, AN 1988-154376 & SU-A1-1 350 829 (MOSC ENG PHYS INST) 7 November 1987, & SU1350829 A1 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 171 (P-1343)24 April 1992 & JP-A-04 015 887 ( MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP. ) 21 January 1992, & JP04015887 A 19920121 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 119 (P-453)(2176) 6 May 1986 & JP-A-60 247 718 ( NITSUSHIN DENKI K.K. ) 7 December 1985, & JP60247718 A 19851207 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 452 (P-1112)27 September 1990 & JP-A-02 181 663 ( NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD. ) 16 July 1990, & JP02181663 A 19900716 | Examination | - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E/SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, June 1987, Bristol, GB, pages 634-635 | by applicant | WO8501621 | SU1350828 | EP0113745 |