EP0540483 - Process of thermal treatment in tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.11.1998 [1998/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K. No. 6-6, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | For all designated states Tanaka Kikinzoku Kogyo K.K. No. 6-6, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsui, Masaaki No. 3-1, Aza-Kumada, Oaza-Nagakute Nagakute-cho, Aichi-gun, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Toshifumi No. 201, Tsutsujigaoka, Meito-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Tatsuya No. 1-42, Juocho Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP | [1993/18] | Representative(s) | Pellegri, Alberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | Pellegri, Alberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Puccini, 7 I-21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 92830590.3 | 29.10.1992 | [1993/18] | Priority number, date | JP19910309854 | 29.10.1991 Original published format: JP 30985491 | [1993/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540483 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61N2/00, A61F7/12 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
A61N2/00 (EP,US);
A61F7/12 (EP,US);
A61N1/406 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/18] | Title | German: | Behandlung durch in Gewebe induzierte Wärme | [1993/18] | English: | Process of thermal treatment in tissue | [1993/18] | French: | Traitement par chaleur induite dans les tissus | [1993/18] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 18.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/46] | 23.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | Request for further processing for: | 26.05.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.1997 | Decision despatched | 24.10.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 15.11.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0040512 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]) | [X] - IEEE/8TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE ENGINEERING IN MEDECINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY vol. 3, 10 November 1986, USA pages 1448 - 1453 DEMER & AL 'Ferromagnetic thermoseed materials for tumor hyperthermia' | [A] - MEDICAL PHYSICS vol. 18, no. 4, August 1991, NEW YORK USA pages 794 - 803 MOLLOY & AL 'Thermodynamics of movable inductively heated seeds for the treatment of brain tumors' |