EP0548032 - Electric arc evaporator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNICOAT S.r.l. Via G. Verdi 20 I-24060 Pianico Bergamo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states UNICOAT S.r.l. Via G. Verdi 20 I-24060 Pianico, Bergamo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Belletti, Manuela 20 Via G. Verdi I-24060 Pianico, Bergamo / IT | [1993/25] | Representative(s) | Manzoni, Alessandro MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo n. 2 25021 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | Manzoni, Alessandro MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo n. 2 I-25021 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 92830665.3 | 10.12.1992 | [1993/25] | Priority number, date | IT1991BS00137 | 13.12.1991 Original published format: IT BS910137 | [1993/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0548032 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0548032 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, C23C14/32 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
H01J37/32055 (EP);
C23C14/325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/25] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Bogenentladungsverdampfer | [1993/25] | English: | Electric arc evaporator | [1993/25] | French: | Dispositif d'évaporation par décharge d'arc | [1993/25] | File destroyed: | 02.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 29.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/41] | 18.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3793179 (DOLOTOV J, et al); | [A]EP0277341 (BALZERS HOCHVAKUUM [LI]); | [Y]EP0417780 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED [CS]) |