EP0504120 - Method and apparatus for subsoil drilling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNDERGROUND TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3800 Byron Highway, Building B Byron California 94513 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states UNDERGROUND TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3800 Byron Highway, Building B Byron, California 94513 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinnan, Frank R. 570 Baldwin Rod Camas Valley, Oregon 97416 / US | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Kristiansen, Alf P., et al Albihns Göteburg AB Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Kristiansen, Alf P., et al Albihn West AB, Box 142 S-401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 92850037.0 | 19.02.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | US19910670744 | 15.03.1991 Original published format: US 670744 | [1992/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504120 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/06 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
E21B7/067 (EP,US);
E21B7/065 (EP,US);
E21B7/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1992/38] | Title | German: | Verfaren und Gerät für Erdbohrungen | [1992/38] | English: | Method and apparatus for subsoil drilling | [1992/38] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le sondage du terrain de fondement | [1992/38] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 29.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/29] | 26.02.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3190374 (JEAN CAPERAN, et al); | [X]US4957173 (KINNAN FRANK R [US]) |