EP0541500 - Scanning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nobel Biocare AB (reg. no. 556002-0231) Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | [1997/14] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states Nobelpharma AB Box 5190 S-402 26 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersson, Matts Hammarströms Täppa 2 S-443 39 Lerum / SE | 02 /
Carlsson, Lennart Matildebergsgatan 36 S-431 38 Mölndal / SE | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Olsson, Gunnar Nobel Biocare AB (publ) Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | [2008/40] |
Former [1996/19] | Olsson, Gunnar Nobelpharma AB Box 5190 S-402 26 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1993/19] | Falk, Bengt Bofors AB, Patents and Trademarks S-691 80 Karlskoga / SE | Application number, filing date | 92850249.1 | 23.10.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | SE19910003204 | 01.11.1991 Original published format: SE 9103204 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541500 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0541500 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/42, A61C13/00, G01B5/20 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
G05B19/4207 (EP,US);
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C9/008 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31205 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33249 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34142 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45167 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45172 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49008 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/19] | Title | German: | Abtasteinrichtung | [1993/19] | English: | Scanning device | [1993/19] | French: | Dispositif de balayage | [1993/19] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 20.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 04.06.1998 | [1998/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4997369 (SHAFIR AARON [IL]); | [Y]EP0420990 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0455855 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [Y] - ASSOCIATION FOR INTEGRATED MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY - 22ND ANNUAL MEETING & TECHNICAL CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS 14 May 1985, ST. LOUIS, MO. HIDEMASA IIDA ET AL. 'Cam Station and Part Drawing Reader with 32-Bit Microprocessors' | [Y] - ROBOTICS AND COMPUTER-INTEGRATED MANUFACTURING vol. 5, no. 2-3, 1989, pages 173 - 181 G. PRITSCHOW, G. GRUHLER 'AUTOMATIC PROGRAMMING OF INDUSTRIAL ROBOTS BY SENSOR GUIDANCE' |