Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0543791
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
31.10.1997 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] |
18.07.1997 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
07.03.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.11.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.10.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.07.1996 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
06.07.1996 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
13.06.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.06.1996 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
11.04.1996 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
21.12.1995 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.02.1995 |
First examination report |
|
25.01.1995 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] |
01.12.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] |
08.04.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] |