EP0543791 - A lifting vehicle for stacking loads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BT Industries Aktiebolag Svarvargatan 6 595 81 Mjölby / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | For all designated states BT Industries Aktiebolag Svarvargatan 8 S-59581 Mjölby / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holmberg, Gert Lustigkullevägen 84 S-591 45 Motala / SE | [1993/21] | Representative(s) | Berglund, Erik Wilhelm Berglunds Patentbyrå AB Aspebråten 590 55 Sturefors / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Berglund, Erik Wilhelm Berglunds Patentbyra AB Aspebraten S-590 54 Sturefors / SE | ||
Former [1993/21] | Norin, Klas Kooperativa förbundet Patent Department P.O. Box 15200 S-104 65 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 92850274.9 | 18.11.1992 | [1993/21] | Priority number, date | SE19910003391 | 18.11.1991 Original published format: SE 9103391 | [1993/21] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0543791 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/075, B60N2/38 | [1993/21] | CPC: |
B60N2/38 (EP);
B66F9/0759 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/21] | Title | German: | Hubfahrzeug zur Lagerung von Lasten | [1993/21] | English: | A lifting vehicle for stacking loads | [1993/21] | French: | Véhicule élévateur pour le stockage de charges | [1993/21] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 02.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/51] | 22.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/51] | Request for further processing for: | 18.05.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 21.05.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.07.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |