EP0494131 - Rubber compositions providing improved rubber-vulcanisate properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1998 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solutia Europe N.V./S.A. Avenue de Tervuren, 270-272 1150 Brussels / BE | [1998/05] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states MONSANTO EUROPE S.A. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box 1 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lynch, Eric Royle Rue W. Degouve de Nuncques 16 B-1040 Brussels / BE | 02 /
Devaux, Albert Firmin Léon Ghislain Rue des Hayeffes 6 B-5870 Mont Saint Guibert / BE | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Colens, Alain M.G.M., et al Bureau Colens SPRL Rue Franz Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Colens, Alain, et al c/o Bureau Colens SPRL rue Frans Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1992/28] | Ernst, Hubert, et al Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No. 21 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 92870001.2 | 02.01.1992 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | EP19910870002 | 04.01.1991 Original published format: EP 91870002 | [1992/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494131 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/37, C08K5/09, C08L21/00 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
C08K5/09 (EP);
C08K5/372 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/09, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K5/372, C08L21/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/28] | Title | German: | Kautschukmischungen mit verbesserten Vulkanisateigenschaften | [1992/28] | English: | Rubber compositions providing improved rubber-vulcanisate properties | [1992/28] | French: | Compositions de caoutchouc avec des propriétés améliorées de vulcanisats | [1992/28] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 10.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/51] | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2048777 ; | [A]US4125515 ; | [AD]EP0401193 |