Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
02.02.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] |
23.11.1994 | First examination report | |
22.06.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] |
19.03.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] |